IL HB4284 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Electric Vehicle Charging Act. Provides that the Act applies to new or renovated residential or nonresidential buildings with parking. Provides that a new or renovated residential building is required to have a certain percentage, based on the number of units in the residential building, of its total parking spaces either electric vehicle ready or electric vehicle capable. Provides that a new or renovated nonresidential building is required to have 30% of its total parking spaces electric vehicle ready. Provides various requirements related to electric vehicle charging stations for unit owners. Provides various requirements related to electric vehicle charging systems for renters.
Title
ELECTRIC VEHICLE CHARGING ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 018-012-000 |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4284&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4284.htm |