IL HB4264 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates various amounts from the State Coronavirus Urgent Remediation Emergency Fund to the Department of Public Health for the administration of HIV/AIDS programs, including, but not limited to, the Getting to Zero-Illinois program. Effective immediately.
Title
$IDPH-HIV/AIDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2022-01-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-01-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-01-11 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-12-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4264&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/PDF/10200HB4264.pdf |