IL HB4259 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0830
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0830
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. In the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article, provides that the definition of "employee" does not include a person who on or after the effective date becomes an employee of the following participating instrumentalities: the Illinois Municipal League; the Illinois Association of Park Districts; the Illinois Supervisors, County Commissioners and Superintendents of Highways Association; the United Counties Council; the Will County Governmental League; or certain other associations and not-for-profit corporations. In the State Universities Article, provides that a person who, on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, becomes an employee of any association of community college boards organized under a certain provision of the Public Community College Act, the Association of Illinois Middle-Grade Schools, the Illinois Association of School Administrators, the Illinois Association for Supervision and Curriculum Development, the Illinois Principals Association, the Illinois Association of School Business Officials, or the Illinois Special Olympics shall not be deemed an employee under the Article. Provides that an individual that begins employment after the effective date of the amendatory Act with an entity not defined as an employer in the Article shall not be deemed an employee for the purposes of the Article. Provides that in the case of doubt as to whether any person is an employee, as defined in the Article, the decision of the Board of Trustees shall be final. In the Downstate Teacher Article, provides that an employee of a school board association who becomes an employee after the effective date of the amendatory Act is not a teacher for the purposes of the Article.
Title
PEN CD-ELIGIBILITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0830 |
2016-08-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2016 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2016-04-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel and Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2016-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-08-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2015-08-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2015-07-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2015-07-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2015-07-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-07-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2015-07-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2015-07-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2015-07-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-07-28 | House | First Reading |
2015-07-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-07-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-07-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-07-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-07-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2015-07-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2015-07-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2015-07-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 15-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |