IL HB4257 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0730
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0730
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill but removes the changes regarding the 5-year renewal cycle.
Title
SCH CD-RENEW EDUCATOR LICENSE
Sponsors
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0730 |
2022-05-06 | House | Effective Date May 6, 2022 |
2022-05-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-07 | House | House Concurs |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 113-000-000 |
2022-04-06 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000 |
2022-04-03 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2022-04-01 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-01 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-03-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-008-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-02-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-02 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000 |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-12-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-12-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |