IL HB4257 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-3)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0829
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-3)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0829
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Requires the Department of Human Services to issue upon the request of a person medically diagnosed with autism spectrum disorder, or the guardian or custodian of the person, an Autism Spectrum Disorder wallet card that specifies that the cardholder has been medically diagnosed with autism spectrum disorder. Requires the Department to establish, by rule, the proof required in order to obtain an Autism Spectrum Disorder wallet card and the process for administration of the card. Permits the Department to collect a reasonable fee for the issuance of the card not to exceed $10.
Title
DHS-AUTISM-WALLET CARD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0829 |
2016-08-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 118-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2016-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-002 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2016-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2016-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000 |
2016-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-07-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-07-28 | House | First Reading |
2015-07-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |