IL HB4251 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Control Act. Provides that excess funds for the registration and microchipping of dogs and cats placed in the county animal population control fund may be transferred to the county treasury by a majority vote of the county board.
Title
COUNTY ANIMAL POPULATION FUND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Tabled |
2018-01-31 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2018-01-26 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4251&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4251.htm |