IL HB4246 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Educator Licensure Article of the School Code. Provides for the reinstatement of a lapsed Professional Educator License upon the payment by the applicant of a $50 penalty (rather than a $500 penalty). Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-LAPSED EDUCATOR LICENSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2022-04-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0710 |
2022-04-27 | House | Effective Date April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-04-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2022-03-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 012-000-000 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-02-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2022-02-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-01-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-01-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2022-01-11 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-12-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |