IL HB4246 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-04 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-04 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State may issue special registration plates designated as Defense Superior Service license plates to recipients awarded the Defense Superior Service Medal by a branch of the armed forces of the United States. Provides that no registration fee shall be charged for the issuance or renewal of a Defense Superior Service plate.
Title
DEFENSE SUPERIOR SERVICE PLATE
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-01-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |