IL HB4239 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the COVID-19 Religious Exemption Act. Provides that it shall be unlawful for any person, public or private institution, or public official to discriminate against any person in any manner because of such person's refusal to obtain, receive, or accept a COVID-19 vaccination contrary to his or her belief. Requires all health care facilities to adopt written access to care and information protocols that are designed to ensure that belief-based objections do not cause impairment of patients' health and that explain how belief-based objections will be addressed in a timely manner to facilitate patient care. Provides that it is unlawful for any public or private employer, entity, agency, institution, official, or person to deny admission because of, to place any reference in its application form concerning, to orally question about, to impose any burdens in terms or conditions of employment on, or to otherwise discriminate against, any applicant, in terms of employment, admission to or participation in any programs for which the applicant is eligible, or to discriminate in relation thereto, in any other manner, on account of the applicant's refusal to obtain, receive, or accept a COVID-19 vaccination that is against the applicant's beliefs. Provides that it is unlawful for any public official, guardian, agency, institution, or entity to deny any form of aid, assistance, or benefits, or to condition the reception in any way of any form of aid, assistance, or benefits, or in any other manner to coerce, disqualify, or discriminate against any person, otherwise entitled to such aid, assistance, or benefits, because that person refuses to obtain, receive, or accept a COVID-19 vaccination contrary to the person's belief. Allows any person injured by any public or private person, association, agency, entity, or corporation by reason of any action prohibited by the Act to bring an action. Provides that a person who brings an action shall recover threefold the actual damages, the costs of the action, and reasonable attorney's fees, but in no case shall recovery for each violation be less than $2,500 plus costs of the action and reasonable attorney's fees. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
COVID-19 RELIGIOUS EXEMPTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-12-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-12-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-12-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-12-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-12-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-12-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-12-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2021-12-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-12-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2021-12-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-12-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-12-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-12-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2021-12-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-12-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-11-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Niemerg |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4239&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4239.htm |