IL HB4229 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Taxpayer's Fiscal Charter Act. Provides for a discretionary spending freeze for fiscal years 2019 and 2020. Sets forth requirements to increase discretionary spending beginning in fiscal year 2021. Requires any new spending proposed by the General Assembly in addition to existing obligations shall be accompanied by a proposed source of revenue to pay for the proposed spending or specified cuts necessary to offset the proposed spending. Prohibits unfunded mandates. Requires the publishing of certain information before voting on or enacting an appropriations bill. Effective immediately.
Title
TAXPAYER FISCAL CHARTER ACT
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Davidsmeyer [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] | Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R] |
Rep. Barbara Wheeler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-08-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-02-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2018-01-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4229&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4229.htm |