IL HB4153 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the First Responders Suicide Prevention Act. Makes the First Responders Suicide Task Force permanent. Provides that that the Task Force shall issue an annual report to the General Assembly on or before December 31 of each year (rather than the Task Force shall issue a final report on December 31, 2020 and, one year after the filing of its report, is dissolved). Effective immediately.
Title
FIRST RESPONDER-SUICIDE PREV
Sponsors
Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. Michael Kelly [D] | Rep. Dave Vella [D] |
Rep. Sam Yingling [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to Police & Fire Committee |
2021-12-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-09-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 840 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4153&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4153.htm |