IL HB4150 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Beginning January 1, 2030, prohibits the installation or operation of drycleaning machines that use perchloroethylene. Until that date, authorizes the use of (i) perchloroethylene drycleaning machines that have only a primary control system, but only for the remainder of each machine's useful life and at the facility at which it is located on the effective date of the amendatory Act and (ii) perchloroethylene drycleaning machines that have primary and secondary control systems. Beginning January 1, 2013, prohibits a person from operating a drycleaning machine unless (i) a person with specified training is present at the facility during the machine's operation and (ii) certain secondary containment measures are in place. Authorizes the Environmental Protection Agency, by rules adopted before July 1, 2013, to require manufacturers of alternatives to perchloroethylene to provide information about those products to the Agency. Requires the Agency to review the safety and legality of the perchloroethylene alternatives. Defines "drycleaning", "drycleaning machine", "drycleaning solvents", "perchloroethylene drycleaning machine", "primary control system", "refrigerated condenser", and "secondary control system". Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-PERCHLOROETHYLENE BAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-17 | House | Assigned to Environmental Health Committee |
2012-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2012-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4150&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4150.htm |