IL HB4145 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Natural Resources (Conservation) Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Authorizes the Department to charge an annual vehicle admission fee and daily access fee for entrance to properties owned, managed, or both by the Department. Provides that the annual vehicle admission fee must not exceed $25 for each vehicle or $15 for each motorcycle and that the daily access fee may not exceed $5 for each vehicle or $2.50 for each pedestrian, bicyclist, or motorcyclist. Provides that the Department must not charge an annual vehicle admission fee or a daily access fee to Illinois residents who are either disabled or veterans and must charge discounted fees to seniors. Provides that vehicles with current registered environmental or sportsman series license plates are exempt from these fees. Authorizes the Department to create a volunteer pass program that would allow each person who provides 500 or more hours of volunteer service at a State park (and up to 3 of his or her guests) to enter properties owned, managed, or both by the Department without paying an annual vehicle admission fee or a daily access fee. Requires revenue generated by the annual vehicle admission and daily access fees to be deposited into the State Parks Fund. Provides that each State park shall receive 100% of the revenue that it generates from these fees for its operation and maintenance costs. Authorizes the Department to adopt any rules necessary to implement these fees. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
DNR-ENTRANCE FEES + VOL. PASS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-10 | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-27 | First Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-02-27 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4145&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4145.htm |