IL HB4144 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Interscholastic Athletic Organization Act. Requires an association or other entity that has as one of its purposes promoting, sponsoring, regulating, or in any manner providing for interscholastic athletics or any form of athletic competition among schools and students within this State to adopt a policy to allow students enrolled in a school that is not in session because employees are on strike to participate in a State series hosted by that association or other entity. Provides that the policy shall allow a school board member, school administrator, or parent volunteer to oversee the students participating in the State series during the strike. Provides that the school district and a school board member, school administrator, or parent volunteer who oversees students participating in a State series shall incur no liability, except for willful or wanton conduct, while the school board member, school administrator, or parent volunteer is overseeing students. Effective immediately.
Title
SCHOOL STRIKE-ATHLETES
Sponsors
Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] |
Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4144&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4144.htm |