IL HB4143 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. In provisions concerning criminal damage to property and criminal defacement of property, expands existing penalty enhancements to include damage or defacement to historic monuments, displays, statues, properties listed on the National Register of Historic Places, and properties designated as having landmark status by any county, township, or municipality.
Title
CRIM CD PROPERTY DAMAGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-11 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-09-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2021-09-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2021-09-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-09-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 21-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 21-1.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4143&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4143.htm |