IL HB4137 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on August 31 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 31 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that the Illinois State Police and State Board of Elections shall establish an automatic voter registration program that allows an application for, application for renewal of, or change of address form for a Firearm Owner's Identification Card or a concealed carry license to serve as a dual-purpose application to register to vote in Illinois, change his or her registered residence address or name as it appears on the voter registration rolls, affirmatively decline to register to vote, and attest to meting the qualifications to register to vote. Provides that a completed, signed application for a Firearm Owner's Identification Card or concealed carry license shall constitute a signed application to register to vote in Illinois at the residence address indicated in the application unless the person affirmatively declined in the application to register to vote or to change his or her registered residence address or name. Requires the Illinois State Police to electronically transmit to the State Board of Elections personal information needed to complete the person's registration to vote in Illinois at his or her residence address. Makes conforming changes in the Election Code, Firearm Owners Identification Card Act, and the Firearm Concealed Carry Act.
Title
ELEC CODE-VOTER REGISTRATION
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] |
Rep. Blaine Wilhour [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2022-01-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2022-01-11 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections Committee |
2022-01-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-11-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-10-28 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-09-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-09-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-08-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1A-16.1a | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-16.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 1A-16.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 13.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
430 | 66 | 57 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4137&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4137.htm |