IL HB4117 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on October 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that no person may acquire or possess any pre-packaged explosive components within this State without having in his or her possession a Firearm Owner's Identification Card previously issued in his or her name by the Department of State Police. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Prohibits the knowing sale, manufacture, purchase, possession, or carrying of a trigger modification device. Defines "trigger modification device". Creates the offense of unlawful sale or delivery of pre-packaged explosive components. Defines "pre-packaged explosive components". Establishes penalties for these offenses. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRIGGER MOD; PRE PACK EXPLOSIV

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 48 N: 54 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-10-26HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Lost 048-054-000
2017-10-26House3/5 Vote Required
2017-10-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-10-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2017-10-24HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-10-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-10-24HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 007-005-000
2017-10-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-10-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-10-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-10-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-10-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-10-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-10-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-10-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-10-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-10-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2017-10-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-10-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-10-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-10-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-10-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-10-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-17HouseFirst Reading
2017-10-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
430651Amended CodeCitation Text
430651.1Amended CodeCitation Text
430652Amended CodeCitation Text
430653Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-4.3New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback