IL HB4116 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Amends the Cannabis Regulation and Tax Act. Repeals provisions concerning employment and employer liability. Amends the Right to Privacy in the Workplace Act. Defines terms. Provides that discharge for the presence of tetrahydrocannabinol is permissible if the employee works in a safety sensitive position, if the employee demonstrates impairment, or if the test results for tetrahydrocannabinol exceeds the limits under specified provisions of the Illinois Vehicle Code. Replaces references to "cannabis" with "tetrahydrocannabinol" and "premises" with "workplace". Provides that nothing in the Act prohibits an employer from enforcing a pre-employment drug testing policy, random drug testing policy, or a drug-free workplace policy or from disciplining an employee or withdrawing a job offer to an applicant for violating such policy if the policy is applied to employees working in safety sensitive positions. Removes the effective date. Makes other changes.
Title
RIGHT TO PRIVACY-DRUG TEST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 010-004-002 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 4, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-041-001 |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 015-011-000 |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 015-012-000 |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-02-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-01-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-01-11 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-09-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-09-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-08-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-08-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-07-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 55 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |