IL HB4106 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Higher Education COVID-19 Vaccine Requirement Prohibition Act. Provides that an institution of higher education may not require a person to obtain a COVID-19 vaccination or show a COVID-19 vaccine credential as a condition of enrollment at the institution of higher education or participation as a student in any of its programs. Defines terms. Amends the College Student Immunization Act to make a related change. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-VACCINE REQUIREMENT
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] | Rep. Adam Niemerg [R] | Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] |
Rep. Blaine Wilhour [R] | Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] | Rep. Chris Miller [R] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-09-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-09-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-06-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-06-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-06-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-06-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-06-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-06-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2021-06-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 20 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4106&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4106.htm |