IL HB4099 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that, subject to federal approval, for any redesign of certain hospital assessments and payments authorized under the Code, the volume data used to redesign the distribution of hospital payments shall include managed care organization denial payments or settlements between hospitals and managed care organizations. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-ASSESSMENTS/PAYMENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-10-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-12 | House | First Reading |
2017-09-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-09-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 14-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5A-12.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5A-12.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5A-12.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5A-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4099&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4099.htm |