IL HB4086 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the corporate authorities of Jo Daviess County may impose up to a 1% additional hotel tax in the county if the tax is approved by referendum initiated by a petition or by ordinance of the corporate authorities of the county. Prohibits taxes from being imposed on gross rental receipts of permanent residents of a hotel, motel, or resort. Provides that the additional hotel tax shall be used by the county for the costs associated with providing infrastructure, police protection, and emergency services in support of tourism and conventions within the county. Effective immediately.
Title
JO DAVIESS COUNTY-HOTEL INCOME
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1030 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4086&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4086.htm |