IL HB4066 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0497
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0497
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides for enhanced penalties if the defendant at the time of the commission of the offense is a pre-trial detainee at a penal institution or is serving a sentence at a penal institution and obtains or uses a communication service without the authorization of, or compensation paid to, the communication service provider, or assists or instructs any other person in doing so with intent to defraud the communication service provider.
Title
CRIM CD-INMATES COMMUNICATIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-14 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0497 | |
2009-08-14 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-14 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-26 | First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-27 | First Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Paul D. Froehlich |