IL HB4012 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Regulatory Sunrise Review Act. Establishes a process to investigate and review the necessity of new regulation over a previously unregulated profession or occupation or the expansion of the scope of practice thereof. Provides that any professional or occupational group or organization, any individual, or any other interested party may submit to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation an application for sunrise review of proposed legislation to regulate a profession or occupation that at the time of application does not require authorization by any agency of the State to practice or the expansion of the scope of practice of a licensed profession or occupation. Establishes minimum criteria for sunrise review. Provides that the Department shall establish the Sunrise Review Unit to consider applications for sunrise review. Specifies actions the Department may take in the course of considering an application for sunrise review. Provides that after evaluating the application, the Department shall submit its final report to the General Assembly. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
REGULATORY SUNRISE REVIEW ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-05-11 | House | Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-11 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |