IL HB4007 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that sex education course material and instruction in grades 6 through 12 must include an age-appropriate discussion on sexting; defines "sexting". Provides that the discussion on sexting must include an exploration of: (i) the possible consequences of sexting, (ii) the identification of situations in which bullying or harassment result from sexting, (iii) the possible long-term consequences of sexting, (iv) the importance of using the Internet safely, (v) the identification of individuals in the school or community that may be contacted for assistance with issues, concerns, or problems, and (vi) the development of strategies for resisting peer pressure and for communicating in a positive manner. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SEX EDUCATION-SEXTING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2020-02-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 020-000-000 |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-01-15 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-01-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-01-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-01-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading |
2019-12-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-9.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |