IL HB3994 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-12 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-12 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that in distribution of the remaining funds received under the federal Help America Vote Act, the State Board of Elections may make such funds available to election authorities for the maintenance of secure collection sites for the return of vote by mail ballots. Allows election authorities to establish curb-side voting for individuals to cast a ballot during early voting or on election day. Provides that an election authority's curb-side voting program shall designate at least 2 election judges from opposite parties per vehicle and the individual must have the option to mark the ballot without interference from the election judges. Requires election authorities to accept any vote by mail ballot returned, including ballots returned with insufficient or no postage. Allows election authorities to establish secure collection sites for postage-free return of vote by mail ballots. Provides for the collection and processing of vote by mail ballots submitted to collection sites. Provides that the State Board of Elections shall establish additional guidelines for the security of collection sites. Effective immediately.
Title
GENDER NEUTRAL STATUTORY REF
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-12 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-01-12 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-01-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-01-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-018-000 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 11, 2021 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-01-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-01-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 10, 2021 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-003-001 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2020-03-04 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2020-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading |
2019-12-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |