IL HB3948 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0750
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0750
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Exempts police emergency equipment from the definition of "commercial motor vehicle". Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-POLICE CDL EXEMPTION
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] | Rep. Dena Carli [D] |
Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Rep. Sidney Mathias [R] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0750 |
2012-07-06 | House | Effective Date July 6, 2012 |
2012-07-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-15 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2012 |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 009-000-000 |
2012-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2012-04-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Mu |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 9, 2012 |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dena M. Carli |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2012-02-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 |
2012-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2012-01-24 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2012-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2012-01-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |