IL HB3910 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Title Insurance Act. Provides that the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation or his authorized agents shall, from time to time, conduct visits of registered agents to ensure compliance with the Act and verify that proper internal controls are being maintained. Removes language providing that: (i) upon a showing of good cause, the Secretary or his authorized agent has the authority and power to require any title insurance company to take all legal means to obtain the appropriate records of its registered agents and make them available for examination at a time and place designated by the Secretary and (ii) expenses incurred in the course of such examinations will be the responsibility of the title insurance company. Requires that each title insurance company shall remit (rather than pay), for all of its title insurance agents subject to this Act for filing an annual registration of its agents, an amount collected from the consumer (was, an amount) equal to $3 for each policy issued by all of its agents in the immediately preceding calendar year. Provides that each application for registration as a title insurance agent shall be made on a form specified by the Secretary and prepared by (rather than prepared in duplicate by) each title insurance company which the agent represents. Requires the title insurance company to retain the copy of the application and forward a copy (rather than the original) to the Secretary. Makes other changes.
Title
TITLE INS AGENT VISITATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 83 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0104 |
2015-07-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-07-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 083-026-001 |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. David B. Reis |
2015-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-002 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 011-000-001 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-024-000 |
2015-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-04-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-04-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-04-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015 |
2015-04-16 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015 |
2015-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 155 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 155 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 155 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |