IL HB3902 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0629
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes and an updated statutory base. Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the exemption for materials, parts, equipment, components, and furnishings incorporated into or upon an aircraft applies through December 31, 2024 (in the introduced bill, the exemption applies permanently). Provides that no claim for credit or refund is allowed for taxes paid as a result of the disallowance of the exemption on or after January 1, 2015 and prior to the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

USE OCC TX-EXEMPT AIRCRAFT PTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-05 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - Motion in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0629
2020-02-06HouseEffective Date February 5, 2020
2020-02-05HouseBoth Houses Override Total Veto
2020-02-05SenateOverride Governor Veto - Senate Passed 054-001-000
2020-02-05Senate3/5 Vote Required
2020-02-05SenateMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2020-02-04SenatePlaced Calendar Total Veto February 5, 2020
2020-02-04HouseOverride Governor Veto - House Passed 107-000-002
2020-02-04House3/5 Vote Required
2020-01-28HouseMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Monica Bristow
2020-01-28HousePlaced on Calendar Total Veto January 28, 2020
2019-11-25HouseGovernor Vetoed
2019-11-20HouseSent to the Governor
2019-11-14HousePassed Both Houses
2019-11-14SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-001-002
2019-11-14Senate3/5 Vote Required
2019-11-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-11-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 14, 2019
2019-11-13SenateSecond Reading
2019-11-13SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-11-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-11-13SenateDo Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
2019-11-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
2019-11-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2019-11-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
2019-11-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2019-11-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2019-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2019-11-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2019-11-06SenateAssigned to Revenue
2019-11-06SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019
2019-10-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-10-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-10-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-10-30SenateFirst Reading
2019-10-30SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-10-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-10-30SenateArrive in Senate
2019-10-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001
2019-10-30House3/5 Vote Required
2019-10-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-10-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-10-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-10-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2019-10-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-10-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-10-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-000-000
2019-10-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-10-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-10-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-10-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-10-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2019-10-21HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019
2019-10-21HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-10-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-10-17HouseFirst Reading
2019-10-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2019-10-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
2019-10-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-10-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-09-30HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-09-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-09-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-09-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-09-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-09-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351053-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351103-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351153-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3902&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3902.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3902eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3902enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3902gms.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0629.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3902ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB3902_10302019_005000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB3902_11142019_003000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB3902_02042020_002000M.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB3902_02052020_001000M.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback