IL HB3901 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-01 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-01 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Payday Loan Reform Act. Changes the definition of "payday loan" to include any loan with a finance charge exceeding an annual percentage rate of 36% (instead of with a finance charge exceeding an annual percentage rate of 36% and with a term that does not exceed 120 days). Deletes a provision that a specified charge is considered fully earned as of the date on which the loan is made. Provides that no lender may make a payday loan with installment payments unless the installment payments are substantially equal term payments, and when a consumer repays a payday loan in full before its due date, the lender shall rebate the unearned finance charges to the consumer on a straight-line amortization basis as of the date of repayment. Requires the licensee, as part of the information that he or she must collect and maintain, to include the total number of lawsuits filed by the licensee or its agent against consumers to collect on payday loans from consumers during the preceding calendar year. Prohibits a licensee or a person making payday loans from evading the requirements and prohibitions of the Act by use of a device or subterfuge including, but not limited to, (i) disguising a payday loan as a different type of transaction, or (ii) characterizing a required fee as a purchase of a good or service in connection with a payday loan. Authorizes the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to develop rules to determine if any person or entity seeks to evade the applicability of this Act by any device, subterfuge, or pretense. Effective immediately.
Title
PAYDAY LOAN-LOAN TERMS
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Dunkin [D] | Rep. Keith Farnham [D] | Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] | Rep. Julie Hamos [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-01 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2009-03-31 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2009-03-31 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Julie Hamos | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-26 | First Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-02-26 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3901&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB3901.htm |