IL HB3874 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Reinforces that no person shall operate, register, or maintain registration of a motor vehicle in this State unless the motor vehicle is covered by a liability insurance policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-MANDATORY VEH INSURANCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0202
2017-08-18HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-18HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-26HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-000-000
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017
2017-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Insurance; 010-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Insurance
2017-03-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-29SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-004-000
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-707Amended CodeCitation Text
62557-601Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback