IL HB3836 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall seek approval from the United States Department of Agriculture to participate in the federal SNAP Online Purchasing Pilot program to enable recipients of benefits provided under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP) to use their SNAP benefits to purchase groceries from eligible online grocery retailers. Provides that upon federal approval, the Department shall enter into an agreement with any online grocery retailer that is eligible to participate in the federal SNAP Online Purchasing Pilot program and may adopt rules.
Title
DHS-SNAP-ONLINE GROCERIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2020-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |