IL HB3835 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that the Department of State Police may not retain, copy, or distribute any information previously collected under this Act on a firearm transfer inquiry system check. Requires the Department to destroy all records of the Firearms Transfer Inquiry Program system with respect to the call or request, other than the identifying number and the date the number was assigned, and all records of the system relating to the person or the transfer, within 45 days after the request, except: (1) if the transfer of a firearm is denied by the Department of State Police, the Department may keep the records of a denial in perpetuity, unless the denial is appealed and overturned then the records shall be destroyed; or (2) if the record is part of a criminal investigation initiated prior to the 45 day limit. Defines "transfer". Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARM OWNERS ID-RECORDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3835&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3835.htm |