IL HB3834 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Natural Resources Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Sen. Terry Link [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-03 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 95 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 95 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 95 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1148 |
2014-12-31 | House | Effective Date December 31, 2014 |
2014-12-31 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-12-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-12-03 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-12-03 | House | House Concurs |
2014-12-03 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 095-019-000 |
2014-12-03 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 095-019-000 |
2014-12-03 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-12-03 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2014-12-03 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2014-12-03 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-12-03 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-12-03 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2014-12-03 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2014-12-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2014-12-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2014-12-03 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Link |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 010-000-000 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading December 2, 2014 |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-001-000 |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 20, 2014 |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 4, 2014 |
2014-11-18 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 29, 2014 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2014-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2014-04-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 801 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |