IL HB3817 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0008
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0008
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the FY 2024 Budget Implementation Act. Makes changes in State programs necessary to implement the State budget for Fiscal Year 2024. Effective immediately, except that some provisions take effect on other specified dates.
Title
FY24 BUDGET IMPLEMENTATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-27 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 73 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-27 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 73 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-27 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 73 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0008 |
2023-06-07 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2024; ; Some Provisions |
2023-06-07 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2023; ; Some Provisions |
2023-06-07 | House | Effective Date June 7, 2023; ; Some Provisions |
2023-06-07 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-27 | House | House Concurs |
2023-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 073-038-000 |
2023-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 073-038-000 |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-004-000 |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-004-000 |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Executive Committee |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Executive Committee |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2023-05-25 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2023-05-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2023-05-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-05-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2023-05-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2023-05-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2023-05-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2023-05-25 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2023-05-25 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2023-05-25 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2023-05-25 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2023-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 3 |
2023-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-020-000 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Sims |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 007-002-000 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Executive |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2023-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernández |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2023-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Matt Hanson |