IL HB3794 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that insurers that provide coverage for diabetic self-management supplies must limit the total amount an insured is required to pay for diabetic self-management supplies to $100 per 30-day supply of diabetic self-management supplies required by an insured with diabetes for diabetic self-management. Provides that the limitation on diabetic self-management supplies costs also applies to provisions requiring coverage of certain diabetes items to be subject to the same coverage, deductible, co-payment, and co-insurance provisions under a policy. Defines "diabetic self-management supplies". Makes conforming changes in the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, the Limited Health Service Organization Act, and the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act. Effective January 1, 2022.
Title
INS-PRICING/DIABETIC SUPPLIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bradley Stephens |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.3f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 125 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 130 | 4003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 165 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 356w | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 375 | 6.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1069.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-4-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |