IL HB3785 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Private Employment Agency Act. In provisions concerning application for license, removes requirement that the Department of Labor investigate the fitness of the premises to be used. In provisions concerning referrals, removes references to referrals by telegraph. Repeals a provision granting the Department police powers. Renumbers provisions concerning definitions and makes technical corrections. Makes other technical corrections. Effective immediately.
Title
PRIVATE EMPLOYMENT AGENCY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0278 |
2017-08-22 | House | Effective Date August 22, 2017 |
2017-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 3, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-013-000 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-05 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 029-000-000 |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-22 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 515 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 515 | 1.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 515 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 515 | 13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
225 | 515 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 515 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |