IL HB3785 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the County Jail Good Behavior Allowance Act. Adds definition of "committed person" to the Act. Provides that "committed person" means a person confined in a county jail whether serving a term of imprisonment or confined pending trial or sentencing. Provides that "good behavior" means the compliance by a person with all rules and regulations of the institution and all laws of the State while confined in a county jail whether serving a sentence of imprisonment or confined in the county jail pending trial or sentencing. Provides that no committed person may be penalized more than 30 days of good behavior allowance for any one infraction unless the infraction is the second or subsequent infraction within any 30-day period in which case the committed person may not be penalized more than 60 days of good behavior allowance.
Title
COUNTY JAIL GOOD BEHAVIOR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-04 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0259 |
2015-08-04 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-08-04 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-20 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2015 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2015-04-21 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-04-21 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 130 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 130 | 3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |