IL HB3785 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Flood Prevention District Act. In a Section concerning flood prevention retailers' and service occupation taxes, eliminates a deposit into the Tax Compliance and Administration Fund. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
FLOOD PREVENTION-TCAF
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-21 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-02 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2014-01-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 750 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3785&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB3785.htm |