IL HB3779 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the For-Profit Community Corrections Prohibition Act. Provides that on or after the effective date of the Act, the State shall not contract with a for-profit prison company for community correctional supervision of persons in the custody of the Department of Corrections or the Department of Juvenile Justice. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be construed to allow privatization prohibited by the Private Correctional Facility Moratorium Act. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be construed to prohibit the renewal of a contract with a for-profit prison company for community correctional supervision of persons in the custody of the Department of Corrections or the Department of Juvenile Justice that was in effect immediately preceding the effective date of the Act. Defines "community correctional supervision" and "for-profit prison company".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOR-PROFIT COM CORRECTIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback