IL HB3771 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Defibrillator at Sporting Events Access Act. Provides that a unit of local government must ensure, through a permitting process or otherwise, that an automated external defibrillator is available for organized marathons, races, and sporting events within the jurisdiction of the unit of local government and is easily accessible for use by participants and spectators at the marathon, race, or sporting event.
Title
DEFIBRILLATOR ACCESS ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Remains in Cities & Villages Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto |