IL HB3751 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Provides for the listing of additional interests on the statement of economic interests for members of the General Assembly and candidates for nomination or election to the General Assembly. Makes conforming changes.
Title
STATEMENTS OF ECON INTEREST
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Blaine Wilhour [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] |
Rep. Martin McLaughlin [R] | Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Mark Luft [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 420 | 4A-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 4A-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3751&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3751.htm |