IL HB3748 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0514
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0514
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Veterans Affairs Act. Requires the Department of Veterans' Affairs, in consultation with the Human Rights Commission, to inform State residents who are veterans, members of the Armed Forces of the United States, members of the Illinois National Guard, or members of any reserve component of the Armed Forces of the United States that any employer who refuses to hire a prospective employee on the basis of military status commits an act of unlawful discrimination in violation of the Illinois Human Rights Act and is subject to civil penalties as provided under that Act. Grants the Department rulemaking authority to implement this provision.
Title
VETS-EMPLOYER DISCRIMINATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0514 |
2016-06-30 | House | Effective Date June 30, 2016 |
2016-06-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 112-000-001 |
2016-05-25 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Margo McDermed |
2016-05-25 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2016-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 019-000-000 |
2016-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Re-Referred to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2016-04-12 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-12 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2016-03-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Clayborne |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 17, 2016 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading June 23, 2015 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 21, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 15, 2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2015-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2015-04-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 019-000-000 |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |