IL HB3711 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Energy Assistance Act. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity may not set the annual eligibility level for energy assistance higher than 60% of the State median income as established by the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. Requires the Department to ensure that households with children under the age of 6 years old are offered a priority application period. Provides that the Supplemental Low-Income Energy Assistance Fund is not subject to sweeps, administrative charge-backs, or any other fiscal or budgetary maneuver that would in any way transfer any amounts from the Supplemental Low-Income Energy Assistance Fund into any other fund of the State. Contains provisions concerning certain unspent funds being utilized for weatherization expenses; allowances to Local Administrative Agencies for administrative expenses; incremental changes to the monthly energy assistance charges billed to utility customers; Department reports on monies collected and allocated to utilities for implementation of their Percentage of Income Payment Plans; and other matters. Provides that all energy assistance programs under the Act shall be available to eligible residents regardless of immigration status.
Title
LIHEAP-ENERGY ASSISTANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-05-04 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 20 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 20 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 20 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 20 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3711&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3711.htm |