IL HB3701 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Educational Credit for Military Experience Act. Provides that before June 1, 2018, each institution of higher education shall adopt a policy to award academic credit for military training applicable to the student's certificate or degree requirements. Requires the policy to apply to any individual who is enrolled in the institution of higher education and who has completed a military training course that meets certain requirements. Provides that institutions of higher education shall develop procedures for evaluating courses and awarding credit. Requires institutions of higher education to submit their policies for awarding credit to the Board of Higher Education and the Illinois Community College Board for review before June 30, 2018 and before June 30 of every other year thereafter. Requires the Board of Higher Education to college data in the Illinois Higher Education Information System on students who are veterans or have military service to assess enrollment and completions outcomes.
Title
HIGHER ED-MILITARY EXP
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0195 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 6, 2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |