IL HB3687 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that it is unlawful for any person to knowingly make a video record or transmit live video of another's intimate parts. Provides that in any criminal proceeding, any property or material that constitutes child pornography shall remain in the care, custody, and control of either the State or the court. Determines when a victim is considered unable to give knowing consent. Defines terms. Makes other changes.
Title
CRIM CD-KNOWING CONSENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 11-0.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-1.60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-1.70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-20.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 26-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3687&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3687.htm |