IL HB3687 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Modifies Sections concerning energy efficiency and demand-response measures to require a utility under those Sections to develop a program that provides residential and small commercial customers a rebate for customer investment in technologies which result in at least a 3% reduction in the customers' energy usage from the previous calendar year. Provides accompanying requirements for the developed programs. Effective immediately or on the date that specified provisions of Public Act 99-906 take effect, whichever is later.
Title
UTILITY-ENERGY EFFICIENCY
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Burke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | To Resources and Management Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Energy Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 8-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 8-103B | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 8-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3687&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3687.htm |