IL HB3684 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0194
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Food Handling Regulation Enforcement Act. Provides that beginning January 1, 2018, any individual who has completed specified training requirements shall be considered a certified food service sanitation manager or a certified food service sanitation manager instructor. Removes provisions providing that a food service sanitation manager certificate or food service sanitation manager instructor certificate shall be provided by the Department of Public Health and removes corresponding provisions concerning the Department charging specified fees for the certificates. Removes provisions concerning recertification and certificate reciprocity. Provides that beginning January 1, 2018, a food service sanitation manager certificate or food service sanitation manager instructor certificate issued by an exam provider shall be valid for 5 years and nontransferable (currently, the certificates are provided by the Department, valid for 5 years, nontransferable, and may be revoked by the Department). Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOOD SERVICE SANITATION CERT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0194
2017-08-18HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-18HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Public Health; 007-000-000
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Public Health
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-04-19SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-04-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-06SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 005-000-000
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4106253Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback