IL HB3671 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0518
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0518
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Assistance Animal Integrity Act. Defines terms. Provides that a housing provider who receives a request from a person to make an exception to the housing provider's policy prohibiting or restricting animals on the housing provider's property because the person requires the use of an assistance animal may require the person to produce reliable documentation of the disability and disability-related need for the animal only if the disability or disability-related need is not readily apparent or known to the housing provider. Provides requirements for documentation that a person has a disability and requires the use of an assistance animal as a reasonable accommodation in housing under the federal Fair Housing Act or the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that a housing provider may deny a documented request for accommodation or rescind a granted request if the accommodation imposes either an undue financial and administrative burden or a fundamental alteration to the nature of the operations of the housing provider or if, after conducting an individualized assessment, there is reliable objective evidence that the specific assistance animal: (i) poses a direct threat to the health or safety of others that cannot be reduced or eliminated by another reasonable accommodation; (ii) causes substantial physical damage to the property of others that cannot be reduced or eliminated by another reasonable accommodation; or (iii) has engaged in a pattern of uncontrolled behavior that its handler has not taken effective action to correct. Provides that a housing provider may require a resident to cover the costs of repairs for damage the animal causes to the resident's dwelling unit or the common areas, reasonable wear and tear excepted, in the same manner it would for damage caused by any other resident, but may not require a resident to pay a pet-related deposit, pet fee, or related pet assessment and also may not require purchase of special liability insurance or coverage for the assistance animal. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be construed as requiring documentation of a specific diagnosis regarding a disability or disability-related need. Provides that nothing in the Act prohibits a housing provider from verifying the authenticity of the documentation submitted under the Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law to the contrary, a housing provider shall not be liable for injuries caused by a person's assistance animal permitted on the housing provider's property as a reasonable accommodation to assist the person with a disability. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be construed to: limit individuals' rights under specified laws; or limit the liability of housing providers under such laws.
Title
SERVICE ANIMALS-ACCOMMODATIONS
Sponsors
Rep. Andre Thapedi [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Arthur Turner [D] |
Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0518 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-001 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Villivalam |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 008-000-001 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 010-000-001 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-001 |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-03-27 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |