IL HB3611 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Railroad Supplier Diversity Act. Defines terms. Provides that each Class I railroad company shall, no later than April 15 of each year, submit to the Illinois Commerce Commission an annual report containing certain information concerning procurement goals and spending for female-owned, minority-owned, veteran-owned, and small business enterprises. Provides that the reports shall be submitted in the form and manner required by the Commission. Provides that the Commission and each railroad company subject to the Act shall hold an annual workshop open to the public on the state of supplier diversity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RAILROAD SUPPLIER DIVERSITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 006-003-000
2017-03-21HouseRemains in Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-03-21HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 002-001-000
2017-03-21HouseSuspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-03-21HouseMoved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-16HouseTo Railroads, Ports and Aviation Subcommittee
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback