IL HB3566 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Provides that the minimum standards for child care licensing include regulations to allow for staffing flexibility of qualified early childhood assistants to enable the early childhood assistants to supervise a classroom outside of the core developmental hours of the day, which shall not exceed more than 3 hours in a single day and shall be documented in the program's Enhanced Staffing Plan. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to provide for emergency rulemaking by the Department of Children and Family Services. Effective immediately.
Title
CHILD CARE-MIN STANDARDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-09-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2023-07-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2023-07-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-06-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-06-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-06-26 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2023-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2023-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2023-05-19 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-19 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-19 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-05-19 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2023-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 3 |
2023-05-19 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Pacione-Zayas |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000 |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2023 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2023 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Early Childhood Education; 006-000-000 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Early Childhood Education |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Early Childhood Education |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Early Childhood Education |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2023-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2023-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 015-000-000 |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 10 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |